NC S827 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Ch. SL 2018-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Ch. SL 2018-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extend Agricultural Disaster Program Deadline
Title
Extend Agricultural Disaster Program Deadline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Ch. SL 2018-141 | |
2018-12-13 | Signed by Gov. 12/13/2018 | |
2018-12-13 | Pres. To Gov. 12/13/2018 | |
2018-12-13 | Ratified | |
2018-12-13 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-12-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-12-05 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Filed |