NC S81 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Sales Tax Economic Nexus For Remote Sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Economic Nexus For Remote Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2018-06-29HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-15HouseRef To Com On Finance
2017-06-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-14HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2017-06-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-06-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-08SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-07SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-07SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-07SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-01SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-02-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-02-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-14SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback