NC S807 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-06 - Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Finance
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-06 - Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Finance
Summary
Public Safety Registration.
Title
Public Safety Registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-06 | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-07-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-30 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S807 |