NC S805 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Coronavirus Relief Funds/Create Offsets
Title
Coronavirus Relief Funds/Create Offsets
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Deanna Ballard [R] |
Sen. Charles Edwards [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2020-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Amendment Ruled Out of Order A1 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-15 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Filed |