NC S802 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Ch. SL 2018-122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Ch. SL 2018-122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mineral Springs Deannexations
Title
Mineral Springs Deannexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Ch. SL 2018-122 | |
2018-06-29 | Ratified | |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2018 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-14 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Held As Material |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Filed |