NC S793 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School Modifications
Title
Charter School Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - House - M12 Suspend Rules C RPT Adoption (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A11 Ramsey Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A10 Lewis Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A9 Stam Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A8 Jeter Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A6 Brandon M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A5 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A5 Lewis M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A4 Fisher M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A3 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A2 Riddell Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - House - M12 Suspend Rules C RPT Adoption (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A11 Ramsey Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A10 Lewis Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A9 Stam Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A8 Jeter Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A6 Brandon M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A5 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A5 Lewis M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A4 Fisher M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A3 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A2 Riddell Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Ch. SL 2014-101 | |
2014-08-06 | Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014 | |
2014-07-29 | Pres. To Gov. 07/29/2014 | |
2014-07-28 | Ratified | |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-25 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2014 |
2014-07-24 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-01 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A7 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A11 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A10 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A9 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A8 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Tabled A6 |
2014-06-25 | House | Postponed To 06/26/2014 |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Tabled A4 |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2014 |
2014-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-18 | House | Ref To Com On Education |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Filed |