NC S777 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-559
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-559
Summary
Affiliate Liability For OTP Excise Tax.
Title
Affiliate Liability For OTP Excise Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-559 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-08 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-08 | Com Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-08 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S777 |