NC S74 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Town of Chapel Hill Charter/Investments
Title
Town of Chapel Hill Charter/Investments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Ch. SL 2021-65 | |
2021-07-02 | Ratified | |
2021-06-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2021-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chapel Hill
Chaptered
Charters
Investments
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Orange County
Ratified
Session Laws
Chaptered
Charters
Investments
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Orange County
Ratified
Session Laws