NC S739 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ch. SL 2021-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ch. SL 2021-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Redistricting Plan 2021/SBK-7
Title
Senate Redistricting Plan 2021/SBK-7
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 4 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 5 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 6 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 7 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 8 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 4 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 5 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 6 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 7 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment 8 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | Ch. SL 2021-173 | |
2021-11-04 | Ratified | |
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/04/2021 |
2021-11-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-11-03 | House | Ref To Com On Redistricting |
2021-11-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-11-03 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A8 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A7 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A6 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A5 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A4 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A3 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A2 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Amend Tabled A1 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Redistricting and Elections |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
120 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |