NC S735 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Various OLB and Administrative Law Changes
Title
Various OLB and Administrative Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-15 - House - A1 Jones, Bert Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A2 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A3 Saine Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A4 Warren Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A5 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A6 Horn Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A2 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A3 Saine Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A4 Warren Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A5 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - A6 Horn Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-06-15 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-15 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-06-15 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2018 |
2018-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H974 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform