NC S730 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Failed Concur In H Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

The No Patient Left Alone/Collaboratory Funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The No Patient Left Alone/Collaboratory Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - A1 Ross Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-25HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-22HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2020-06-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-19SenateEngrossed
2020-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-11SenateRe-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2020-06-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-05-28SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-05-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-05-13SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S730
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S730v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/776
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/775
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1023
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1022
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/869
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1049
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1048

Bill Comments

feedback