NC S726 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-547
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-547
Summary
Amend House Arrest Laws/Adult/Juvenile.
Title
Amend House Arrest Laws/Adult/Juvenile.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-547 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Juvenile Justice, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S726 |