NC S723 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Prevention/Emergency Management Act
Title
Clarify Prevention/Emergency Management Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H963 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate