NC S720 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Jim Weaver, State CIO
Title
Confirm Jim Weaver, State CIO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Adopted
Appointments
Chief Information Officer
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Public Officials
Resolutions
Simple
Appointments
Chief Information Officer
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Public Officials
Resolutions
Simple