NC S711 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Ch. SL 2018-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

NC Farm Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Farm Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - Veto Override (Y: 74 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A1 Bell, J. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A2 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A3 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A4 Blust Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - House - A5 Riddell Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A6 Dixon Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A7 Blust Second Reading (Y: 56 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - House - A8 Blust Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Ch. SL 2018-113
2018-06-27HouseVeto Overridden
2018-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2018
2018-06-26HouseReceived from Senate
2018-06-26SenateVeto Overridden
2018-06-26SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-25 Vetoed 06/25/2018
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-15 Ratified
2018-06-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-14SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-14SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2018-06-14HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-14HouseOrdered Engrossed
2018-06-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-13HouseAmend Failed A8
2018-06-13HouseAmend Failed A7
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A6
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A5
2018-06-13HouseAmend Failed A4
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A3
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A2
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-13HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-13HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary III Stricken
2018-06-12HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2018-06-12HouseReptd Fav
2018-06-12HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary III Added
2018-06-12HouseRef to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance
2018-06-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-11SenateEngrossed
2018-06-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-11SenateAmend Adopted A4
2018-06-11SenateAmend Adopted A3
2018-06-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-07SenateAmend Adopted A2
2018-06-07SenateAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-06SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-06SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2018-06-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2018-06-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-04SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
2018-06-04SenateSequential Referral To Judiciary Added
2018-06-04SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2018-06-04SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2018-06-04SenateSequential Referral To Finance Stricken
2018-06-04SenateSequential Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2018-05-31SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-05-31SenateWithdrawn From Com
2018-05-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-05-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-16SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S711&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v7.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S711v8.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=594
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=593
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=592
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=603
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=602
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=601
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1106
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1105
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1104
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1103
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1102
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1101
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1100
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1099
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1098
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=699
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1163
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=767
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1273

Bill Comments

feedback