NC S707 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Ch. Res 2018-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Jt Session/State Bd of Education Confirmation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jt Session/State Bd of Education Confirmation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateCh. Res 2018-5
2018-06-26 Ratified
2018-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2018-02-08HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2018-02-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2018-02-07HousePlaced On Cal For 02/08/2018
2018-02-07HouseCal Pursuant 32
2018-02-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-02-07HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2018-02-07SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-02-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-02-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-02-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback