NC S697 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Ch. Res 2018-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Jt Session/State Bd of Education Confirmation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jt Session/State Bd of Education Confirmation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateCh. Res 2018-6
2018-06-28 Ratified
2018-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-27SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2018-06-27SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-27SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2018-06-27HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-10-17HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-10-17HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-10-16HousePlaced On Cal For 10/17/2017
2017-10-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-10-16HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2017-10-16SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-10-16SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-10-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-10-16SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-10-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-10-16SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback