NC S695 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Various Education Changes
Title
Various Education Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - A1 Gill Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2021-09-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - A1 Gill Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2021-09-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Ch. SL 2021-170 | |
2021-10-15 | Signed by Gov. 10/15/2021 | |
2021-10-08 | Pres. To Gov. 10/8/2021 | |
2021-10-07 | Ratified | |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/06/2021 |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-09-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-29 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2021 |
2021-09-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Accounting
Boards
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Definitions
Education
Education Administration
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Employment
Health Services
Kindergarten
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Occupations
Personnel
Presented
Principals
Professional Education
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
State Board Of
Boards
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Definitions
Education
Education Administration
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Employment
Health Services
Kindergarten
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Occupations
Personnel
Presented
Principals
Professional Education
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
State Board Of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 218.105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 302.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 316 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 438 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 75.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 86.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 86.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 86.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text |