NC S691 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency Operating Funds for Utilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Operating Funds for Utilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-18HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-17HousePlaced On Cal For 09/18/2019
2019-09-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-16HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-09-16HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-09-16SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-09-16SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-09-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-09-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-09-11SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
2019-09-11SenateRef To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
2019-09-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-09-10SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback