NC S683 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Combat Absentee Ballot Fraud
Title
Combat Absentee Ballot Fraud
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Kirk deViere [D] |
Sen. Valerie Jean Foushee [D] | Sen. Natasha Marcus [D] | Sen. Erica Smith-Ingram [D] | Sen. Teresa Van Duyn [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-28 - House - A5 Beasley Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-08-28 - House - A6 Pittman Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - A7 Warren Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - A2 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - A3 Dahle Second Reading (Y: 58 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-08-27 - House - A4 Hardister Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 5 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-28 - House - A5 Beasley Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-08-28 - House - A6 Pittman Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - A7 Warren Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - A2 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - A3 Dahle Second Reading (Y: 58 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-08-27 - House - A4 Hardister Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 5 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Ch. SL 2019-239 | |
2019-11-06 | Signed by Gov. 11/6/2019 | |
2019-10-31 | Pres. To Gov. 10/31/2019 | |
2019-10-30 | Ratified | |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/29/2019 |
2019-10-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/29/2019 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-03 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/11/2019 |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-08-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-08-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-08-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-08-28 | House | Amend Adopted A7 |
2019-08-28 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2019-08-28 | House | Amend Failed A5 |
2019-08-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-27 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2019-08-27 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2019-08-27 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2019-08-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-08-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/27/2019 |
2019-08-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-08-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-07-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-07-09 | House | Ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-07-09 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Amend Tabled A5 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Filed |