NC S669 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Solar Decommissioning Rqmts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Decommissioning Rqmts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2023-04-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2023-04-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-04-13SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-04-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-04-10SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-04-10SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-04-06SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
130A309.06(n/a)Citation Text
130A309.240(n/a)Citation Text
130A309.241(n/a)Citation Text
130A309.242(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback