NC S66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Game Nights
Title
Allow Game Nights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H130 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Ch. SL 2019-13