NC S648 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-235
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-235
Summary
Allow DOT to Provide Direct Funding.
Title
Allow DOT to Provide Direct Funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Goss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Ch. SL 2009-235 | |
2009-06-30 | Signed By Gov. 6/30/2009 | |
2009-06-23 | Pres. To Gov. 6/23/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Ratified | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-17 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1004 (Same As) 2009-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S648 |