NC S638 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Ch. SL 2013-265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Ch. SL 2013-265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Farm Act of 2013
Title
NC Farm Act of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A3 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A2 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A3 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A2 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | Ch. SL 2013-265 | |
2013-07-17 | Signed by Gov. 7/17/2013 | |
2013-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 07/10/2013 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-06-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2013-06-27 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-06-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |