NC S636 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-11 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-11 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Athletic Transparency
Title
School Athletic Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2023-09-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-04 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-04 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Boards
Charter Schools
Commerce
Corporations
Council Of State
Diseases & Health Disorders
Education
Education Cabinet
Elementary Education
Health Services
Home Schooling
Lgbtq & Gender Issues
Minors
Mou
Ngos
Nonprofit
Notification
Public
Public Health
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Reporting
Safety
Secondary Education
Sports
State Board Of
Student Athletes
Students
Supt. Of
Administrative Rules
Boards
Charter Schools
Commerce
Corporations
Council Of State
Diseases & Health Disorders
Education
Education Cabinet
Elementary Education
Health Services
Home Schooling
Lgbtq & Gender Issues
Minors
Mou
Ngos
Nonprofit
Notification
Public
Public Health
Public Instruction
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Officials
Reporting
Safety
Secondary Education
Sports
State Board Of
Student Athletes
Students
Supt. Of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.50 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.55 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.57 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.60 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.61 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 318.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.1A | (n/a) | Citation Text |