NC S628 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Native Plants Right to Work Act
Title
Native Plants Right to Work Act
Sponsors
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Lisa Barnes [R] | Sen. Amy Galey [R] |
Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] | Sen. Natasha Marcus [D] | Sen. Julie Mayfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Funds & Accounts
Horticulture
Infrastructure
Parks & Recreation Areas
Parks & Recreation Trust Fund
Plants & Trees
Property
Property-state Government
Public
Roads & Highways
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Horticulture
Infrastructure
Parks & Recreation Areas
Parks & Recreation Trust Fund
Plants & Trees
Property
Property-state Government
Public
Roads & Highways
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
136 | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
136 | 41.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 341 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 135.56 | (n/a) | Citation Text |