NC S628 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Ch. SL 2017-204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Various Changes to the Revenue Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Changes to the Revenue Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-03 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Saine Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11 Ch. SL 2017-204
2017-08-11 Signed by Gov. 8/11/2017
2017-08-04 Pres. To Gov. 8/4/2017
2017-08-03 Ratified
2017-08-03SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-08-03SenateConf Report Adopted
2017-08-03HouseConf Report Adopted
2017-08-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-08-03HouseConf Com Reported
2017-08-03SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-08-03SenateConf Com Reported
2017-08-03SenateConferees Changed
2017-06-28HouseConf Com Appointed
2017-06-28SenateConf Com Appointed
2017-06-28SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-28SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-28HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-06-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-27HousePlaced On Cal For 06/28/2017
2017-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2017
2017-06-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-15HouseRef To Com On Finance
2017-06-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-14HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2017-06-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-06-13SenateEngrossed
2017-06-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-12SenateAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-12SenateAmendment Withdrawn A2
2017-06-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2017
2017-06-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-08SenateAmendment Offered Substitute 2
2017-06-08SenateAmendment Offered 1
2017-06-07SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-24SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-05-24SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-05-10SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-10SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-04SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S628&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S628v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=261
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=262
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=270
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=698
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=780
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=781
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=467
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=916
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=533

Bill Comments

feedback