NC S625 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child Welfare, Safety and Permanency Reforms
Title
Child Welfare, Safety and Permanency Reforms
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] | Sen. Sydney Batch [D] | Sen. Amy Galey [R] |
Sen. Gladys Robinson [D] | Sen. Kandie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Adoption
Attorneys
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Confidentiality
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Electronic Government
Ethics
Family Issues
Foster Care
Health Services
Information Technology
Institutionalized Persons
Internet
Judges
Juvenile Code
Local Government
Mental Health
Minors
Notification
Occupations
Personnel
Privacy
Public
Records
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
Attorneys
Child Abuse
Child Custody
Confidentiality
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Electronic Government
Ethics
Family Issues
Foster Care
Health Services
Information Technology
Institutionalized Persons
Internet
Judges
Juvenile Code
Local Government
Mental Health
Minors
Notification
Occupations
Personnel
Privacy
Public
Records
Social Services
Social Services Depts.