NC S622 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Threshold/Medical Expense Deduction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Threshold/Medical Expense Deduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-01-14SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-01-14HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-01-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-01-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-01-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-01-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-01-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-01-14HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2020-01-14HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-22HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-21HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-21SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-20SenateEngrossed
2019-05-20SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-16SenateAmend Tabled A2
2019-05-16SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-15SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-15SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-14SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-14SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-14SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-04SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S622
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S622v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S622v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S622v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S622v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S622v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S622v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/237
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/236
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/235
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/238
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/926

Bill Comments

feedback