NC S609 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
K-12 Scholarship Changes
Title
K-12 Scholarship Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Filed |