NC S60 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Disapprove Various Solid Waste Rule Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disapprove Various Solid Waste Rule Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-03HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-03SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-28SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-17SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-08SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S98 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - Held As Filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
150B19(n/a)Citation Text
150B21.3(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback