NC S593 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Special Education Due Process Hearings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Education Due Process Hearings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-11SenateEngrossed
2021-05-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11SenateAmend Adopted A2
2021-05-11SenateAmend Tabled A1
2021-05-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-05SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2021-05-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-21SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-06SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C106.3(n/a)Citation Text
115C109.6(n/a)Citation Text
115C109.9(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S593
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S593v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S593v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S593v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S593v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51309/0/S593-PCS45418-BE-24
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51708/0/S593-ARQ-35-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51709/0/S593-ABE-26-V-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S593-SMBE-45(e1)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S593-SMBE-45(e1)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S593-SMBE-62(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S593-SMBE-64(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/196
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/195
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/194

Bill Comments 750

feedback