NC S582 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Ch. SL 2021-48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Ch. SL 2021-48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
High School Adjunct Instructors/CC Prep
Title
High School Adjunct Instructors/CC Prep
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Ch. SL 2021-48 | |
2021-06-21 | Signed by Gov. 6/21/2021 | |
2021-06-11 | Pres. To Gov. 6/11/2021 | |
2021-06-10 | Ratified | |
2021-06-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-07 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Education
Government Employees
Higher Education
Occupations
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Secondary Education
State Employees
Teachers
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Education
Government Employees
Higher Education
Occupations
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
Secondary Education
State Employees
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 298.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text |