NC S58 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Ch. SL 2023-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Protect Critical Infrastructure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Critical Infrastructure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-19 Ch. SL 2023-47
2023-06-19 Signed by Gov. 6/19/2023
2023-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2023
2023-06-15 Ratified
2023-06-15SenateOrdered Enrolled
2023-06-15SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2023-06-14SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/15/2023
2023-06-14SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2023-06-14HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2023-06-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2023-06-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2023-06-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2023-06-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2023-06-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-06-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-06-13HouseReptd Fav
2023-06-12HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-06-12HouseWithdrawn From Com
2023-03-16HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2023-03-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2023-03-15HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2023-03-15SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2023-03-14SenateEngrossed
2023-03-14SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2023-03-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2023-03-14SenateAmend Adopted A2
2023-03-14SenateAmend Adopted A1
2023-03-13SenateReptd Fav
2023-03-07SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-03-07SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2023-03-07SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-02-28SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2023-02-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2023-02-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2023-02-15SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-02-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2023-02-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2023-02-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2023-02-01SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14(n/a)Citation Text
14150.2(n/a)Citation Text
14152(n/a)Citation Text
14154(n/a)Citation Text
14156(n/a)Citation Text
14159.12(n/a)Citation Text
1D27(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/S58
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/Senate/PDF/S58v7.pdf
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/S58-SMRI-6(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/S58-SMRI-7(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/S58-SMRI-35(e4)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2023/S58-SMRI-37(e5)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/48
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/47
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/46
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/H/433
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2023/S/275

Bill Comments

feedback