NC S570 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Hold Harmless Star Ratings/ERS Assess. Resume
Title
Hold Harmless Star Ratings/ERS Assess. Resume
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Ch. SL 2021-127 | |
2021-08-30 | Signed by Gov. 8/30/2021 | |
2021-08-26 | Pres. To Gov. 8/26/2021 | |
2021-08-25 | Ratified | |
2021-08-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Day Care
Dhhs
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Employment
Inspections
Kindergarten
Licenses & Permits
Minors
Occupations
Personnel
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
School Staff
Social Services
Teachers
Day Care
Dhhs
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Employment
Inspections
Kindergarten
Licenses & Permits
Minors
Occupations
Personnel
Presented
Professional Education
Public
Ratified
School Staff
Social Services
Teachers