NC S553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regulatory Reform Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Reform Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Conference Rpt for Adoption Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 78 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-07-08 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - A2 Carter Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - A3 Jones Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 53 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-07-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateFailed To Override Veto
2020-01-14SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-01-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-31SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-30SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/31/2019
2019-10-30SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/30/2019
2019-10-28SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/28/2019
2019-10-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/23/2019
2019-10-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-23SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-09-20 Vetoed 09/20/2019
2019-09-12 Pres. To Gov. 9/12/2019
2019-09-11 Ratified
2019-09-10SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-10SenateConf Report Adopted 3rd
2019-08-29HouseConf Report Adopted 3rd
2019-08-28SenateConf Report Passed 2nd
2019-08-28HouseConf Report Adopted 2nd
2019-08-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27SenateConf Held As Material
2019-08-27SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-27HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-27HouseRuled Material
2019-08-27HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-20SenateConf Rept Withdrawn
2019-08-14SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/20/2019
2019-08-14SenateConf Held As Material
2019-08-14SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-13SenateConferees Changed
2019-07-11HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-07-10SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-10SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-09HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-08HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-08HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-07-08HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-07-08HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-01HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-13HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-13HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-12HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-11HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-06-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-06-10SenateEngrossed
2019-06-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-05SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/10/2019
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S553
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S553v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/284
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/283
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/589
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/588
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/587
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/586
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/585
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/477
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/580
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/794
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/804
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/584
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/663

Bill Comments

feedback