NC S550 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Surety/Bail Bond/Bondsmen Provisions
Title
Modify Surety/Bail Bond/Bondsmen Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added After Judiciary |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Bail
Citizenship
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Employment
Occupational Testing
Occupations
Personnel
Public
Surety & Fidelity
Testing
Citizenship
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Employment
Occupational Testing
Occupations
Personnel
Public
Surety & Fidelity
Testing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 531 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 544.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 544.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 544.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 71-50 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 71-70 | (n/a) | Citation Text |