NC S55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm Reid Wilson/Sec. N & CR

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm Reid Wilson/Sec. N & CR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateAdopted
2021-02-11SenateEngrossed
2021-02-11SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-02-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-02-09SenateRe-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2021-02-09SenateReptd Fav
2021-02-04SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations
2021-02-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-03SenateFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback