NC S55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing Education for General Contractors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Education for General Contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Ch. SL 2019-72
2019-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-26 Ratified
2019-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2019
2019-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-24HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-19HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-04HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-06-04HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-04HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-06-04HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-23HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-23HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-03SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-03SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-26SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
2019-03-26SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2019-03-26SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2019-03-07SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H162 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback