NC S548 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Strengthen Human Trafficking Laws/Studies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthen Human Trafficking Laws/Studies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A1 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A1 McNeill M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20 Ch. SL 2017-151
2017-07-20 Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
2017-06-30 Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
2017-06-30 Ratified
2017-06-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-29SenateConcurred In H/Com Sub
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-29SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2017-06-29HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-29HouseOrdered Engrossed
2017-06-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-29HouseAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-27HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-06-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-27HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2017-06-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-06-26 Engrossed
2017-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-26SenateAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2017
2017-06-22SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-07SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-30SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S548&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S548v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=328
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=329
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=879
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=880
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=881
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=515

Bill Comments

feedback