NC S547 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Ch. SL 2017-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Ch. SL 2017-16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restitution Remission/Notice and Hearing Req
Title
Restitution Remission/Notice and Hearing Req
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Ch. SL 2017-16 | |
2017-05-23 | Signed by Gov. 5/23/2017 | |
2017-05-17 | Pres. To Gov. 5/17/2017 | |
2017-05-16 | Ratified | |
2017-05-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2017-05-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Filed |