NC S544 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Energy, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Energy, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
2021 Water Safety Act
Title
2021 Water Safety Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Deanna Ballard [R] | Sen. Charles Edwards [R] | Sen. Kirk deViere [D] |
Sen. Natasha Marcus [D] | Sen. Julie Mayfield [D] | Sen. Natalie Murdock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Colleges & Universities
Commissions
Deq
Dhhs
Education
Environment
Environmental Review Comn.
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Higher Education
Industrial Waste
Infrastructure
Manufacturing
Policy Collaboratory
Pollution
Public
Reports
Research
Safety
Stem
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Utilities
Waste Management
Water & Sewer Systems
Boards
Budgeting
Colleges & Universities
Commissions
Deq
Dhhs
Education
Environment
Environmental Review Comn.
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Higher Education
Industrial Waste
Infrastructure
Manufacturing
Policy Collaboratory
Pollution
Public
Reports
Research
Safety
Stem
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Utilities
Waste Management
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
116 | 31.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 129 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S544 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S544v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S544v1.pdf |