NC S542 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
SHP Combat Fraud/Property Finders Stnds
Title
SHP Combat Fraud/Property Finders Stnds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-08-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-08-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Ch. SL 2021-157 | |
2021-09-16 | Signed by Gov. 9/16/2021 | |
2021-09-07 | Pres. To Gov. 9/7/2021 | |
2021-09-03 | Ratified | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2021-09-01 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-09-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-09-01 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-08-31 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/26/2021 |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Chaptered
Crimes
Employment
Estates
Fraud
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Licensing & Certification
Notification
Occupations
Presented
Private Protective Services Bd.
Property
Public
Ratified
Salaries & Benefits
Security Services
State Employees
State Health Plan
Teachers
Title Change
Whistleblowers
Chaptered
Crimes
Employment
Estates
Fraud
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Licensing & Certification
Notification
Occupations
Presented
Private Protective Services Bd.
Property
Public
Ratified
Salaries & Benefits
Security Services
State Employees
State Health Plan
Teachers
Title Change
Whistleblowers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
116B | 52 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116B | 78 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116B | 78.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 48.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
28A | 22-11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
28A | 4-2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
28A | 9-1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |