NC S541 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-04 - Ch. SL 2015-237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-04 - Ch. SL 2015-237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulate Transportation Network Companies
Title
Regulate Transportation Network Companies
Sponsors
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. Angela Bryant [D] | Sen. Joel Ford [D] |
Sen. Jeffery Tarte [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-04 | Ch. SL 2015-237 | |
2015-09-04 | Signed by Gov. 9/4/2015 | |
2015-09-01 | Pres. To Gov. 09/01/2015 | |
2015-08-31 | Ratified | |
2015-08-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-08-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/26/2015 |
2015-08-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-08-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-08-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-07-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2015-07-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-07-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H680 (Same As) 2015-04-14 - Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Finance