NC S518 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord/State Bar Notice of Lease Default
Title
Landlord/State Bar Notice of Lease Default
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Ch. SL 2012-76 | |
2012-06-26 | Signed By Gov. 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Ratified | |
2012-06-19 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-13 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |