NC S511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
EV Charging Station/Parking
Title
EV Charging Station/Parking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H788 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S511 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S511v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S511v1.pdf |