NC S508 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil Procedure/Deponent Declaration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Procedure/Deponent Declaration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-15SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H610 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback