NC S50 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Ch. SL 2021-53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Estate Planning Law Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estate Planning Law Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - A2 Morey Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Ch. SL 2021-53
2021-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2021
2021-06-17 Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2021
2021-06-16 Ratified
2021-06-15SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-15SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2021-06-14SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/15/2021
2021-06-14SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-06-10HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-09HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-06-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-09HouseAmend Failed A2
2021-06-09HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-06-08HousePlaced On Cal For 06/09/2021
2021-06-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-06-08HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-03-09HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-02HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-02HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-03-02SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-03-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-02-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/01/2021
2021-02-24SenateReptd Fav
2021-02-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-02-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-04SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-03SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S50
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S50v7.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/564/0/S50-PCS35066-TG-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1115/0/S50-PCS15102-TC-9
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52021/0/S50-PCS35291-TC-41
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52073/0/S50-ATC-87-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52074/0/S50-ATC-86-V-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTG-4(e1)-v-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTG-4(e1)-v-8
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTG-6(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTC-15(CSTC-9)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTC-17(CSTC-9)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTC-102(e4)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S50-SMTC-106(e5)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/27
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/383
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/384
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/278

Bill Comments

feedback