NC S490 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Various Family Law Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Family Law Changes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-05-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-07SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-15SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H470 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback