NC S474 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Obsolete Bds/Judicial and Admin. Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obsolete Bds/Judicial and Admin. Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - A1 Lewis Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-07-08SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-07-08HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-07-07HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-07-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-07-07HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-07-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-07-07HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-07-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-07-07HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-07-02HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-07-02HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenateEngrossed
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S474
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S474v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S474v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S474v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S474v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S474v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S474v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/183
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/182
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1081
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1080
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1079

Bill Comments

feedback